NC H922 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enhance Insurance Coverage/Educ. Buildings
Title
Enhance Insurance Coverage/Educ. Buildings
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. Dean Arp [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-17 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Ch. SL 2019-176 | |
2019-07-26 | Signed by Gov. 7/26/2019 | |
2019-07-19 | Pres. To Gov. 7/19/2019 | |
2019-07-18 | Ratified | |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-17 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-07-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/17/2019 |
2019-07-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-16 | House | Reptd Fav To Concur |
2019-07-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2019-07-11 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019 |
2019-07-09 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-09 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2019 |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-07 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S483 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Ch. SL 2019-73