NC H917 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

GSC Technical Corrections 2024

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GSC Technical Corrections 2024

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2024-05-30SenateWithdrawn From Com
2024-05-23SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2024-05-23SenatePassed 1st Reading
2024-05-23SenateRegular Message Received From House
2024-05-23HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2024-05-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2024-05-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2024-05-22HouseAdded to Calendar
2024-05-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2024-05-22HouseReptd Fav
2024-05-08HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2024-05-08HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2024-04-30HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2024-04-30HousePassed 1st Reading
2024-04-29HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1(n/a)Citation Text
118(n/a)Citation Text
1569.17(n/a)Citation Text
104E24(n/a)Citation Text
108A(n/a)Citation Text
108A42.1(n/a)Citation Text
108A54.3A(n/a)Citation Text
108A70.9A(n/a)Citation Text
108A70.9B(n/a)Citation Text
108D16(n/a)Citation Text
110(n/a)Citation Text
110130(n/a)Citation Text
115C(n/a)Citation Text
115C284(n/a)Citation Text
115C299(n/a)Citation Text
115C315(n/a)Citation Text
116(n/a)Citation Text
116209.28(n/a)Citation Text
11630.2(n/a)Citation Text
121(n/a)Citation Text
12142(n/a)Citation Text
122C24(n/a)Citation Text
122C24.1(n/a)Citation Text
126(n/a)Citation Text
12681(n/a)Citation Text
12685(n/a)Citation Text
128(n/a)Citation Text
12828(n/a)Citation Text
131D34(n/a)Citation Text
131E129(n/a)Citation Text
131E176(n/a)Citation Text
13548.1(n/a)Citation Text
1356(n/a)Citation Text
14(n/a)Citation Text
14113.7A(n/a)Citation Text
143(n/a)Citation Text
143215.107F(n/a)Citation Text
143215.94G(n/a)Citation Text
144(n/a)Citation Text
1449(n/a)Citation Text
150B34(n/a)Citation Text
150B37(n/a)Citation Text
153A(n/a)Citation Text
153A93(n/a)Citation Text
160A(n/a)Citation Text
160A163(n/a)Citation Text
160D(n/a)Citation Text
160D1311(n/a)Citation Text
16811(n/a)Citation Text
2930(n/a)Citation Text
5011(n/a)Citation Text
5210(n/a)Citation Text
5850-130(n/a)Citation Text
7B(n/a)Citation Text
7B2204(n/a)Citation Text
90A(n/a)Citation Text
90A30(n/a)Citation Text
90A53(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback