NC H911 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Ch. SL 2024-21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Ch. SL 2024-21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Various Local Provisions II
Title
Various Local Provisions II
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 89 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 85 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 85 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Ch. SL 2024-21 | |
2024-06-28 | Ratified | |
2024-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-27 | House | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2024-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2024 |
2024-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2024-06-25 | House | Ruled Material |
2024-06-25 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2024-06-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2024-06-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-05-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/05/2024 |
2024-05-30 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-05-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2024 |
2024-05-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-05-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/29/2024 |
2024-05-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-05-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-05-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-05-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-05-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-05-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-05-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2024-05-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-04-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-04-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-04-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S770 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Subjects
Airports; Annexation; Appointments; Authorities; Aviation; Charters; City Councils; Counties; County Commissioners; Debtor & Creditor; Economic Development; Eminent Domain; Fees; Hotels & Motels; Infrastructure; Rentals & Leasing; Liens; Local; Local Gove
Occupancy; Title Change; Travel & Tourism; Urban Development; Utilities; Water & Sewer Systems; Brunswick County; Pender County; Carteret County; Buncombe County; Henderson County; Cherokee County; Washington County; Asheville; Currituck County; Washingto
Occupancy; Title Change; Travel & Tourism; Urban Development; Utilities; Water & Sewer Systems; Brunswick County; Pender County; Carteret County; Buncombe County; Henderson County; Cherokee County; Washington County; Asheville; Currituck County; Washingto
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 164.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 155 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 272 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 314 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 58.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 63 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 202 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
40A | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
40A | 42 | (n/a) | Citation Text |