NC H91 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Accountability and Fair Play in Athletics

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accountability and Fair Play in Athletics

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-09-23HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-09-23HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2021-09-23HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-09-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-09-23HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-09-23HouseSerial Referral to Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-09-08HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-09-08HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-09-08SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2021-09-08SenateEngrossed
2021-09-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-09-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/08/2021
2021-09-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-09-01SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-08-31SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-08-19SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-07-22SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-22SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-07-22SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-07-21SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-07-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-07-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-07-15SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-06-14SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-18SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-03-18HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-17HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-17HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-17HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-03-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-17HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-11HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-02-23HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-02-23HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-17HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-17HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S103 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Ch. SL 2021-22

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H91
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H91v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H91v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H91v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H91v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H91v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H91v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H91v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H91v7.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/612/0/H91-PCS10053-BC-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1255/0/H91-PCS30158-SVf-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52533/0/H91-PCS40648-TCf-48
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52539/0/H91-PCS30458-TCf-50
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52917/0/H91-PCS30467-TC-52
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52994/0/H91-ATC-108-V-7
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMBC-1(e1)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMSV-9(CSSVf-2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMBC-9(e3)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMTC-119(CSTCf-47)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMTC-120(CSTCf-48)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMTC-121(e4)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMTC-122(CSTCf-50)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMTC-127(CSTC-52)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMTC-128(CSTC-52)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H91-SMTC-129(e6)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/42
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/437
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/436
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/454
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/530

Bill Comments 750

feedback