NC H91 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require Safety Helmets/Under 21
Title
Require Safety Helmets/Under 21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Motion 12/Take Bill Out of Order Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-25 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2017-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Finance |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S66 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate