NC H904 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
North Carolina Rural Job Creation Fund
Title
North Carolina Rural Job Creation Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Appropriations |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Filed |