NC H898 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-09 - Ch. SL 2009-261
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-09 - Ch. SL 2009-261
Summary
No Killing of Grass Carp.
Title
No Killing of Grass Carp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-09 | Ch. SL 2009-261 | |
2009-07-09 | Ratified | |
2009-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-30 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-04-30 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-27 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-08 | Re-ref Com On Marine Resources and Aquaculture | |
2009-04-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-31 | Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Marine Resources and Aquaculture | |
2009-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H898 |