NC H894 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Veterans/Health Care/Youth Suicide Prevention

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans/Health Care/Youth Suicide Prevention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-06-29SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2017-06-28HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-06-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-28HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-26HouseRef To Com On Appropriations
2017-04-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-25HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback