NC H890 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ch. SL 2021-150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

ABC Omnibus Legislation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABC Omnibus Legislation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 95 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10 Ch. SL 2021-150
2021-09-10 Signed by Gov. 9/10/2021
2021-09-08 Pres. To Gov. 9/8/2021
2021-09-08 Ratified
2021-09-08HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-09-08HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-09-08HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-09-08HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-09-08SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2021-09-08SenateEngrossed
2021-09-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-09-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-09-08SenateAmend Adopted A2
2021-09-08SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-09-07SenateReptd Fav
2021-09-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-09-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-09-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-07-22SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-05-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-05-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-05HouseRef to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105113.70(n/a)Citation Text
105113.71(n/a)Citation Text
105113.77(n/a)Citation Text
105113.83A(n/a)Citation Text
105164.13(n/a)Citation Text
106755.3(n/a)Citation Text
106755.4(n/a)Citation Text
130A247(n/a)Citation Text
130A248(n/a)Citation Text
130A250(n/a)Citation Text
14309.26(n/a)Citation Text
14309.27(n/a)Citation Text
14309.28(n/a)Citation Text
14309.35(n/a)Citation Text
14309.36(n/a)Citation Text
150B19(n/a)Citation Text
150B21.1(n/a)Citation Text
153A145.10(n/a)Citation Text
153A145.9(n/a)Citation Text
160A205.4(n/a)Citation Text
160A205.5(n/a)Citation Text
18B1000(n/a)Citation Text
18B1001(n/a)Citation Text
18B1001.4(n/a)Citation Text
18B1004(n/a)Citation Text
18B1006(n/a)Citation Text
18B101(n/a)Citation Text
18B1010(n/a)Citation Text
18B1011(n/a)Citation Text
18B103(n/a)Citation Text
18B1100(n/a)Citation Text
18B1105(n/a)Citation Text
18B1113.1(n/a)Citation Text
18B1114.1(n/a)Citation Text
18B1114.5(n/a)Citation Text
18B1114.7(n/a)Citation Text
18B1203(n/a)Citation Text
18B1303(n/a)Citation Text
18B204(n/a)Citation Text
18B206(n/a)Citation Text
18B302(n/a)Citation Text
18B401(n/a)Citation Text
18B404(n/a)Citation Text
18B502(n/a)Citation Text
18B600(n/a)Citation Text
18B601(n/a)Citation Text
18B602(n/a)Citation Text
18B603(n/a)Citation Text
18B701(n/a)Citation Text
18B800(n/a)Citation Text
18B804(n/a)Citation Text
18B805(n/a)Citation Text
18B900(n/a)Citation Text
18B902(n/a)Citation Text
18B903(n/a)Citation Text
18B904(n/a)Citation Text
18B904.1(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H890
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H890v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H890v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H890v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H890v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H890v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H890v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H890v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H890v7.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51503/0/H890-PCS40581-TQ-25
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51717/0/H890-PCS40624-TQ-27
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52991/0/H890-PCS30474-TQf-34
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53030/0/H890-ASA-64-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53021/0/H890-ATQ-56-V-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H890-SMTQ-53(CSTQ-25)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H890-SMTQ-56(CSTQ-27)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H890-SMTQ-68(CSTQf-34)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H890-SMTQ-70(e4)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H890-SMTQ-125(sl)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H890-SMTQ-125(sl)-v-4
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/326
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/519
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/442
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/441
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/440

Bill Comments

feedback