NC H89 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Housing Authority Transfers
Title
Housing Authority Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 13 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - A2 Moore, R. Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - A1 Moore, R. Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 13 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - A2 Moore, R. Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - A1 Moore, R. Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Ch. SL 2017-178 | |
2017-07-25 | Signed by Gov. 7/25/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-06-20 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-19 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-06-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-19 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-03-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-02-15 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |