NC H89 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DENR Support for Regional Water Supply System
Title
DENR Support for Regional Water Supply System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/02/2013 |
2013-03-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-12 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S113 (Same As) 2013-03-11 - Ref To Com On Environment