NC H885 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modernize Sewer Overflow Notification
Title
Modernize Sewer Overflow Notification
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Farkas [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Amber Baker [D] | Sen. Gale Adcock [D] |
Rep. Johnnie Autry [D] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] |
Sen. Rachel Hunt [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Nasif Majeed [D] | Rep. Raymond Smith [D] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/12/2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Deq
Environment
Health Depts.
Health Services
Infrastructure
Local Government
Notification
Pollution
Public
Public Health
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Environment
Health Depts.
Health Services
Infrastructure
Local Government
Notification
Pollution
Public
Public Health
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | 215.1C | (n/a) | Citation Text |