NC H884 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-520
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-520
Summary
JMAC Modifications.
Title
JMAC Modifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-520 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-07 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-11 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-31 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S783 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Ref To Com On Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H884 |