NC H878 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amend Dangerous Dog Laws
Title
Amend Dangerous Dog Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Patricia McElraft [R] | Rep. Cynthia Ball [D] | Rep. Jerry Carter [R] |
Rep. Allison Dahle [D] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Rep. David Martin [D] | Rep. Marcia Morey [D] |
Rep. Ray Russell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-06 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2019 |
2019-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-26 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2019-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2019-04-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-22 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |