NC H871 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Honoring Our Veterans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring Our Veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HouseAdopted
2017-04-25HousePlaced On Cal For 04/26/2017
2017-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-25HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2017-04-24HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-04-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-21HouseFiled
2017-04-21HouseReptd Fav. For Introduction

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback