NC H870 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Ch. Res 2017-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Confirm Phil Baddour/Industrial Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirm Phil Baddour/Industrial Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26 Ch. Res 2017-9
2017-06-26 Ratified
2017-06-26SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2017
2017-06-22SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-20SenateRe-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations
2017-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-26SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2017-04-25HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-25HouseReptd Fav
2017-04-24HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-04-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-21HouseFiled
2017-04-21HouseReptd Fav. For Introduction

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback