NC H87 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Ch. SL 2023-45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Ch. SL 2023-45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Probation Modifications/Sheriff Authority
Title
Probation Modifications/Sheriff Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - A1 Biggs Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - A1 Biggs Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Ch. SL 2023-45 | |
2023-06-16 | Signed by Gov. 6/16/2023 | |
2023-06-08 | Pres. To Gov. 6/8/2023 | |
2023-06-07 | Ratified | |
2023-06-06 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-06 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2023-06-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2023 |
2023-06-01 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2023-05-31 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-09 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2023-03-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-08 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-03-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/08/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-03-07 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-03-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | 131.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
15A | 1344 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 1344.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 451 | (n/a) | Citation Text |