NC H869 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Ch. SL 2022-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Ch. SL 2022-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
State Bar Grievance Process/Ethics Records
Title
State Bar Grievance Process/Ethics Records
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Robert Reives [D] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] | Rep. Raymond Smith [D] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | Ch. SL 2022-61 | |
2022-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Ratified | |
2022-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-07-01 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2022-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-07-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-21 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-20 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-13 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-12 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-10 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-05 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2021-05-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Attorneys
Chaptered
Commerce
Commissions
Committees
Consumer Protection
Crimes
Disciplinary Hearing Comn.
Electronic Commerce
Ethics
General Assembly
Information Technology
Internet
Legislative Research Comn.
Licensing & Certification
Notification
Occupations
Organized Crime
Presented
Public
Ratified
Reports
Retailing
State Bar
Studies
Teleservices
Title Change
Chaptered
Commerce
Commissions
Committees
Consumer Protection
Crimes
Disciplinary Hearing Comn.
Electronic Commerce
Ethics
General Assembly
Information Technology
Internet
Legislative Research Comn.
Licensing & Certification
Notification
Occupations
Organized Crime
Presented
Public
Ratified
Reports
Retailing
State Bar
Studies
Teleservices
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
84 | 28 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
84 | 32.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |