NC H848 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

RV Dealer Regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RV Dealer Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-04HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-28HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-28HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-18HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback