NC H844 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DOT/Traffic Signal Oversight
Title
DOT/Traffic Signal Oversight
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |