NC H84 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Ch. SL 2021-115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Sex Offender Premises Restrictions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex Offender Premises Restrictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-17 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-23 Ch. SL 2021-115
2021-08-23 Signed by Gov. 8/23/2021
2021-08-20 Pres. To Gov. 8/20/2021
2021-08-19 Ratified
2021-08-18HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-17SenateConf Report Adopted
2021-08-11HouseConf Report Adopted
2021-08-10HousePlaced On Cal For 08/11/2021
2021-08-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2021-08-10HouseConf Com Reported
2021-08-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/16/2021
2021-08-10SenateConf Com Reported
2021-07-13SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-06-09HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-06-09HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2021-06-09HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-06-09HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-06-08HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-06-08SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-06-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-03SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-02SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-06-02SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-27SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-18SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-03-18HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-17HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-17HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-16HousePlaced On Cal For 03/17/2021
2021-03-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-16HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-10HouseReptd Fav
2021-02-17HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-17HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
14(n/a)Citation Text
14208.16(n/a)Citation Text
14208.18(n/a)Citation Text
15A145(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H84
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H84v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H84v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H84v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H84v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H84v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51961/0/H84-PCS10501-TT-21
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52653/0/H84-PCCS40652-SA-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H84-SMSA-8(e1)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H84-SMTU-13(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H84-SMTT-53(CSTT-21)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H84-SMTT-56(e2)-v-1
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/41
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/251
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/380
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/454
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/385

Bill Comments 750

feedback