NC H834 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Juv Capacity/Transfer/Interrog/Confidential
Title
Juv Capacity/Transfer/Interrog/Confidential
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Neal Jackson [R] | Rep. Johnnie Autry [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Frances Jackson [D] | Rep. Ya Liu [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [R] | Rep. Marcia Morey [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - A1 Morey Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-06-08 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-06-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-07 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2023-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2023 |
2023-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-31 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2023-05-31 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-24 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgeting
Courts
Definitions
Developmental Disabilities
Dhhs
Emergency Services
Health Services
Institutionalized Persons
Juvenile Code
Mental Health
Minors
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Budgeting
Courts
Definitions
Developmental Disabilities
Dhhs
Emergency Services
Health Services
Institutionalized Persons
Juvenile Code
Mental Health
Minors
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
7B | 1906 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2101 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2200 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2200.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2202 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2401 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2401.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2401.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2401.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2401.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 2401.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 3103 | (n/a) | Citation Text |