NC H83 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-14)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminate Income Tax for Military Retirees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate Income Tax for Military Retirees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - House - Second Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 95 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-06-21SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-06-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-06-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-14HousePlaced On Cal For 06/16/2021
2021-06-14HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-14HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-14HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-04-13HousePlaced On Cal For 04/14/2021
2021-04-13HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-04-13HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-13HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-01HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-01HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-03-09HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-03-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-16HouseRef to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105(n/a)Citation Text
105153.5(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H83
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H83v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H83v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H83v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H83v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1102/0/H83-PCS40162-BAf-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/2309/0/H83-PCS10230-BAf-7
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H83-SMBA-7(CSBAf-3)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H83-SMBA-18(CSBAf-7)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H83-SMBA-21(e3)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/394
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/393

Bill Comments

feedback