NC H823 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adult Adoptee/Access Original Birth Cert
Title
Adult Adoptee/Access Original Birth Cert
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - A1 Hurley Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - A1 Hurley Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary IV |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |