NC H822 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Comprehensive Behavioral Health Plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Behavioral Health Plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-08-20SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-08-20HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-19HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-19HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-09HousePlaced On Cal For 08/12/2019
2019-08-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-08-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-06HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-31HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-31HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-18HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback