NC H820 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Ch. Res 2019-12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Honor Arlie Culp, Former Member of the GA

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor Arlie Culp, Former Member of the GA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseCh. Res 2019-12
2019-06-18 Ratified
2019-06-17SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-17SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-17SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-06-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-17SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-06-17HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-17HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-17HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-17HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-18HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback