NC H813 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Summary
Uniform Apportionment of Tort Responsibility.
Title
Uniform Apportionment of Tort Responsibility.
Sponsors
Rep. John Blust [R] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Nikita Mackey [D] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D] | Rep. Bonner Stiller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2009-05-13 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S679 (Same As) 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-312
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H813 |