NC H812 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify Remote Meetings During Emergencies
Title
Clarify Remote Meetings During Emergencies
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Sen. Bobby Hanig [R] | Rep. Erin Pare [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Ch. SL 2021-35 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by Gov. 6/16/2021 | |
2021-06-09 | Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2021 | |
2021-06-08 | Ratified | |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Disasters & Emergencies
Emergency Management
Emergency Services
Local Government
Presented
Public
Public Meetings
Ratified
Telecommunications
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Disasters & Emergencies
Emergency Management
Emergency Services
Local Government
Presented
Public
Public Meetings
Ratified
Telecommunications
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
166A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
166A | 19.24 | (n/a) | Citation Text |