NC H806 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Placed On Cal For 07/08/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Open Exercise & Fitness Facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Exercise & Fitness Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 75 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2020
2020-07-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44.2
2020-07-02HouseReceived from the Governor
2020-07-02 Vetoed 07/02/2020
2020-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
2020-06-26 Ratified
2020-06-26HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-26HouseConf Report #3 Adopted
2020-06-25HousePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2020
2020-06-25HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-25SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-25SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-25SenateConf Rpt Recon/withdrawn
2020-06-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-25HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-25HouseConf Rpt Withdrawn
2020-06-25SenateConf Report #2 Adopted
2020-06-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-25HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-25SenateConf Com #2 Reported
2020-06-25SenateConf Rept Withdrawn
2020-06-25HouseConf Rpt Withdrawn
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-25HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-23SenateConf Com Appointed
2020-06-23HouseConf Com Appointed
2020-06-23HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2020-06-19HousePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2020
2020-06-19HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-19HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-19SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-17SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-16SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-16SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-16SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-09SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-02SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-01HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-30HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-29HousePlaced On Cal For 04/30/2019
2019-04-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-26HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-18HouseRef to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H806
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H806v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H806v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H806v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H806v3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/245
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/765
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1009
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/873
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/866
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1067

Bill Comments

feedback