NC H802 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Child Support Order Stayed By Appeal
Title
Child Support Order Stayed By Appeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-20 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Placed On Cal For 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |