NC H794 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Allow Schools in All Zoning Districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Schools in All Zoning Districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/10/2021
2021-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-04HouseRef to the Com on Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
160A(n/a)Citation Text
160A307.1(n/a)Citation Text
160D(n/a)Citation Text
160D701(n/a)Citation Text
160D913.1(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback