NC H794 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-26 - Ch. SL 2009-176
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-26 - Ch. SL 2009-176
Summary
Substitution of Trustees.
Title
Substitution of Trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Ch. SL 2009-176 | |
2009-06-26 | Signed By Gov. 6/26/2009 | |
2009-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Ratified | |
2009-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-05-12 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Placed On Cal For 5/11/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref to the Com on Financial Institutions, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-03-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H794 |