NC H792 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Regular Message Sent To Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Barbers/Electrolysis Boards/Merger

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbers/Electrolysis Boards/Merger

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-24HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-09-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-09-23HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-09-23HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-09-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-09-23HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-09-23HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-06-29HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-06-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-05HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2021-05-05HouseSerial Referral To Finance Added
2021-05-05HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-05-04HouseRef to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
150B21.7(n/a)Citation Text
86A1(n/a)Citation Text
86A10(n/a)Citation Text
86A11(n/a)Citation Text
86A12(n/a)Citation Text
86A13(n/a)Citation Text
86A14(n/a)Citation Text
86A15(n/a)Citation Text
86A16(n/a)Citation Text
86A17(n/a)Citation Text
86A18(n/a)Citation Text
86A19(n/a)Citation Text
86A2(n/a)Citation Text
86A20(n/a)Citation Text
86A20.1(n/a)Citation Text
86A21(n/a)Citation Text
86A22(n/a)Citation Text
86A23(n/a)Citation Text
86A24(n/a)Citation Text
86A25(n/a)Citation Text
86A26(n/a)Citation Text
86A27(n/a)Citation Text
86A3(n/a)Citation Text
86A4(n/a)Citation Text
86A5(n/a)Citation Text
86A6(n/a)Citation Text
86A7(n/a)Citation Text
86A8(n/a)Citation Text
86A9(n/a)Citation Text
86B1(n/a)Citation Text
86B10(n/a)Citation Text
86B11(n/a)Citation Text
86B12(n/a)Citation Text
86B13(n/a)Citation Text
86B14(n/a)Citation Text
86B15(n/a)Citation Text
86B16(n/a)Citation Text
86B17(n/a)Citation Text
86B18(n/a)Citation Text
86B19(n/a)Citation Text
86B2(n/a)Citation Text
86B20(n/a)Citation Text
86B21(n/a)Citation Text
86B22(n/a)Citation Text
86B23(n/a)Citation Text
86B24(n/a)Citation Text
86B25(n/a)Citation Text
86B26(n/a)Citation Text
86B27(n/a)Citation Text
86B28(n/a)Citation Text
86B29(n/a)Citation Text
86B3(n/a)Citation Text
86B30(n/a)Citation Text
86B31(n/a)Citation Text
86B32(n/a)Citation Text
86B33(n/a)Citation Text
86B34(n/a)Citation Text
86B35(n/a)Citation Text
86B36(n/a)Citation Text
86B37(n/a)Citation Text
86B38(n/a)Citation Text
86B39(n/a)Citation Text
86B4(n/a)Citation Text
86B40(n/a)Citation Text
86B41(n/a)Citation Text
86B42(n/a)Citation Text
86B43(n/a)Citation Text
86B44(n/a)Citation Text
86B45(n/a)Citation Text
86B46(n/a)Citation Text
86B47(n/a)Citation Text
86B48(n/a)Citation Text
86B49(n/a)Citation Text
86B5(n/a)Citation Text
86B50(n/a)Citation Text
86B51(n/a)Citation Text
86B52(n/a)Citation Text
86B53(n/a)Citation Text
86B6(n/a)Citation Text
86B7(n/a)Citation Text
86B8(n/a)Citation Text
86B9(n/a)Citation Text
88A1(n/a)Citation Text
88A10(n/a)Citation Text
88A10.1(n/a)Citation Text
88A11(n/a)Citation Text
88A11.1(n/a)Citation Text
88A12(n/a)Citation Text
88A13(n/a)Citation Text
88A14(n/a)Citation Text
88A15(n/a)Citation Text
88A15.1(n/a)Citation Text
88A16(n/a)Citation Text
88A17(n/a)Citation Text
88A17.1(n/a)Citation Text
88A18(n/a)Citation Text
88A19(n/a)Citation Text
88A19.1(n/a)Citation Text
88A2(n/a)Citation Text
88A20(n/a)Citation Text
88A21(n/a)Citation Text
88A22(n/a)Citation Text
88A23(n/a)Citation Text
88A3(n/a)Citation Text
88A4(n/a)Citation Text
88A5(n/a)Citation Text
88A6(n/a)Citation Text
88A7(n/a)Citation Text
88A8(n/a)Citation Text
88A9(n/a)Citation Text
93B2(n/a)Citation Text
93B4(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback