NC H79 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify HS Insurance
Title
Clarify HS Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-15 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-02-24 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/24/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-02-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Casualty
Computers
Council Of State
Data & Records Systems
Distance Education
Education
Education Boards
Education Cabinet
Elementary Education
Friday Institute
Health
Health Services
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Insurance
Internet
Kindergarten
Local Government
Minors
Public
Public Instruction
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Secondary Education
Sports
State Board Of
Student Athletes
Students
Studies
Supt. Of
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Title Change
Unc
Casualty
Computers
Council Of State
Data & Records Systems
Distance Education
Education
Education Boards
Education Cabinet
Elementary Education
Friday Institute
Health
Health Services
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Insurance
Internet
Kindergarten
Local Government
Minors
Public
Public Instruction
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Secondary Education
Sports
State Board Of
Student Athletes
Students
Studies
Supt. Of
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Title Change
Unc
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 407.65 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 31A-60 | (n/a) | Citation Text |