NC H78 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Ch. SL 2021-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Various Education Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various Education Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-11 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-23 Ch. SL 2021-111
2021-08-23 Signed by Gov. 8/23/2021
2021-08-13 Pres. To Gov. 8/13/2021
2021-08-12 Ratified
2021-08-11HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-11HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-08-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-08-11HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-08-10HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-08-10SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-08-09SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-09SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-05SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-04SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-04SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-04SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-07-15SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-02-24SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-24SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2021-02-24HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-02-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-02-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-02-23HousePlaced On Cal For 02/24/2021
2021-02-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-02-23HouseReptd Fav
2021-02-23HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-23HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-16HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115C(n/a)Citation Text
115C549(n/a)Citation Text
115C557(n/a)Citation Text
115C562.5(n/a)Citation Text
116143.3A(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H78
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H78v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H78v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H78v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H78v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H78v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H78v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/605/0/H78-PCS10054-TC-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52577/0/H78-PCS10522-BN-9
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H78-SMTC-7(CSTC-3)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H78-SMBN-43(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H78-SMBN-45(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H78-SMBN-65(sl)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H78-SMBN-65(sl)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/6
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/371
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/455

Bill Comments

feedback