NC H78 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Reptd Unfav
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Reptd Unfav
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enact Medical Cannabis Act
Title
Enact Medical Cannabis Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Reptd Unfav |
2015-03-09 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2015-03-09 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2015-02-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Regulatory Reform |
2015-02-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed |