NC H777 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Ch. SL 2019-211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Pay Increases/SBI & ALE

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pay Increases/SBI & ALE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-28 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Ch. SL 2019-211
2019-08-30 Signed by Gov. 8/30/2019
2019-08-28 Pres. To Gov. 8/28/2019
2019-08-28 Ratified
2019-08-28HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-28HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-08-27SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-08-27HousePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2019
2019-08-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-08-27HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2019-08-26SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/27/2019
2019-08-26SenateConf Com Reported
2019-08-26HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2019-08-26HouseRule 44b
2019-08-26HouseConf Com Reported
2019-08-20SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-08-19HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-08-19HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2019-08-19HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-08-19HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-09HouseRuled Material
2019-07-09HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-09SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-08SenateEngrossed
2019-07-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-02SenateAmend Adopted A2
2019-07-02SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-21SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-20SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-11SenateRe-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-16HouseRef to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H777
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H777v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H777v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H777v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H777v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H777v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H777v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/433
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/410
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/411
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/409
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/428
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/763
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/574
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/798

Bill Comments

feedback