NC H776 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption and Juvenile Law Changes
Title
Adoption and Juvenile Law Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. David Rogers [R] | Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Duane Hall [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Ch. SL 2018-68 | |
2018-06-25 | Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Ratified | |
2018-06-13 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-13 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2018-06-13 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-12 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary III |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |