NC H77 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Ch. SL 2013-9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Ch. SL 2013-9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Law Examiners/Update Expense Law
Title
Board of Law Examiners/Update Expense Law
Sponsors
Rep. John Blust [R] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Rep. Charles McGrady [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - Senate - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Ch. SL 2013-9 | |
2013-03-13 | Signed by Gov. 3/13/2013 | |
2013-03-05 | Pres. To Gov. 3/5/2013 | |
2013-03-04 | Ratified | |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Postponed To 02/19/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/14/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-02-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-07 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S74 (Same As) 2013-02-11 - Ref To Com On Finance