NC H761 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Ch. SL 2021-167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Ch. SL 2021-167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Police Vehicle and Equipment Protection Act
Title
Police Vehicle and Equipment Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-07 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 97 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Ch. SL 2021-167 | |
2021-10-15 | Signed by Gov. 10/15/2021 | |
2021-10-07 | Pres. To Gov. 10/7/2021 | |
2021-10-07 | Ratified | |
2021-10-07 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-07 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-10-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/07/2021 |
2021-10-06 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-10-06 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 4, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Chaptered
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Fines & Penalties
Law Enforcement
Minors
National Guard
Presented
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Reporting
Sentencing
Session Laws
Theft
Chaptered
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Fines & Penalties
Law Enforcement
Minors
National Guard
Presented
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Reporting
Sentencing
Session Laws
Theft
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 56 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 72.9 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 145.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text |