NC H760 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Opportunity Gap Task Force
Title
Opportunity Gap Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-03 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Counties
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
General Assembly
Kindergarten
Ldc
Membership
Minorities
Minors
Opportunity Gap Task Force
Poverty
President Pro Tempore
Public
Reports
Secondary Education
Speaker
Studies
Counties
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
General Assembly
Kindergarten
Ldc
Membership
Minorities
Minors
Opportunity Gap Task Force
Poverty
President Pro Tempore
Public
Reports
Secondary Education
Speaker
Studies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 19.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 19.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 32.02 | (n/a) | Citation Text |