NC H757 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Pender County/Butner Property Transfers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pender County/Butner Property Transfers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19 Ch. SL 2019-137
2019-07-19 Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019
2019-07-11 Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2019
2019-07-10 Ratified
2019-07-09HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-09HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-06-27HousePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-06-27HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-06-27HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-06-27SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-24SenateSequential Referral To Finance Stricken
2019-05-21SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-16HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback