NC H747 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-27 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-27 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Youth Access to Kratom/Study Abuse OTC Subs
Title
Youth Access to Kratom/Study Abuse OTC Subs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-24 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |