NC H746 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Omnibus Gun Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus Gun Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - A7 Holley M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - A6 John M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - A5 Cunningham M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - A4 Morey M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - A3 Butler M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 48 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - A2 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - A1 Millis Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-06-12SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-06-08HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-06-08HouseOrdered Engrossed
2017-06-08HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-07HouseAmend Tabled A7
2017-06-07HouseAmend Tabled A6
2017-06-07HouseAmend Tabled A5
2017-06-07HouseAmend Tabled A4
2017-06-07HouseAmend Tabled A3
2017-06-07HouseAmend Failed A2
2017-06-07HouseAmend Adopted A1
2017-06-06HousePlaced On Cal For 06/07/2017
2017-06-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-01HouseReptd Fav
2017-05-31HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2017-05-31HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-20HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary IV
2017-04-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-13HouseRef To Com On Judiciary I
2017-04-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-11HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H746&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H746v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H746v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H746v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H746v3.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=586
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=587
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=588
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=589
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=590
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=591
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=592
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=593
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=594
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=597

Bill Comments

feedback