NC H744 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Trespass/Eastern Band Cherokee Indians Lands

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trespass/Eastern Band Cherokee Indians Lands

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25 Ch. SL 2018-66
2018-06-25 Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018
2018-06-15 Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
2018-06-14 Ratified
2018-06-13HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-13HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2018-06-12HousePlaced On Cal For 06/13/2018
2018-06-12HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-12HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2018-06-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-12SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-12SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-12SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-12SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-05SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-05SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-27SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-27HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-26HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-20HouseRe-ref Com On State Personnel
2017-04-20HouseReptd Fav
2017-04-13HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, State Personnel
2017-04-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-11HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H744&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H744v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H744v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H744v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H744v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H744v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H744v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=456
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=625
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1080

Bill Comments

feedback