NC H743 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
UI Laws Administrative Changes
Title
UI Laws Administrative Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-25 - House - M11 Concur R3 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 74 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - M11 Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - M11 Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Ch. SL 2013-224 | |
2013-06-27 | Signed by Gov. 6/27/2013 | |
2013-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2013 | |
2013-06-26 | Ratified | |
2013-06-25 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-25 | House | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2013-06-24 | House | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2013-06-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-06-18 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-06-18 | House | Ruled Material |
2013-06-17 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-06-17 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-13 | Engrossed | |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Amend Tabled A2 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |