NC H74 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Taxpayer Refund Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxpayer Refund Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-27HouseRef To Com On Finance
2019-08-27HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-08-27SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-08-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-08-22SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-22SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-08-22SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-08-20SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-02HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-02HousePlaced On Cal For 05/03/2019
2019-05-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-01HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-01HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-01HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
2019-02-14HouseRef to the Com on Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback