NC H736 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Minor Alcohol/Felony if Death Results
Title
Provide Minor Alcohol/Felony if Death Results
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Justin Burr [R] | Rep. Darren Jackson [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Richardson, W. Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Richardson, W. Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |