NC H729 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Charter Schools Omnibus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter Schools Omnibus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-11 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 61 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - A1 von Haefen Third Reading M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 63 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-24HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-08-23HouseReceived from the Governor
2021-08-23 Vetoed 08/23/2021
2021-08-13 Pres. To Gov. 8/13/2021
2021-08-12 Ratified
2021-08-11HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-11HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-08-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-08-11HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-08-10HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-08-10SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-08-09SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-09SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-05SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-04SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-04SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-04SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-07-15SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2021-05-12HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-12HouseAmend Tabled A1
2021-05-12HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-11HousePlaced On Cal For 05/12/2021
2021-05-11HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-05-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-05-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-29HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-29HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115C(n/a)Citation Text
115C218(n/a)Citation Text
115C270.20(n/a)Citation Text
120121(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H729
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H729v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H729v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H729v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H729v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H729v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51698/0/H729-PCS40622-RQ-19
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51848/0/H729-ARQ-37-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52578/0/H729-PCS40649-TC-51
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H729-SMRQ-83(CSRQ-19)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H729-SMRQ-85(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H729-SMTC-123(e2)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H729-SMTC-124(CSTC-51)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H729-SMTC-125(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H729-SMRQ-98(rat)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H729-SMRQ-98(rat)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H729-SMRQ-98(rat)-v-4
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/343
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/342
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/341
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/373
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/457

Bill Comments

feedback