NC H724 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Truth in Caller ID Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Truth in Caller ID Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01 Ch. SL 2019-188
2019-08-01 Signed by Gov. 8/1/2019
2019-07-24 Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2019
2019-07-23 Ratified
2019-07-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-27SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02HousePlaced On Cal For 05/03/2019
2019-05-02HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-30HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-04-30HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-29HousePlaced On Cal For 04/30/2019
2019-04-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRef to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-11HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback